NY S04686 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to court ordered forensic evaluations and reports in child custody and visitation proceedings.
Title
Relates to court ordered forensic evaluations and reports in child custody and visitation proceedings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.765 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A05621 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.215