NY S04681 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3988
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3988
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a coronavirus disease 2019 (COVID-19) public employee death benefit for individuals who reported to their usual place of employment or an alternate worksite at the direction of their employer on or after March 1, 2020 and such individual contracted COVID-19 within 45 days of reporting to such workplace as confirmed by a laboratory test or by a licensed physician and such individual died on or before December 31, 2022.
Title
Establishes a coronavirus disease 2019 (COVID-19) public employee death benefit for individuals who reported to their usual place of employment or an alternate worksite at the direction of their employer on or after March 1, 2020 and such individual contracted COVID-19 within 45 days of reporting to such workplace as confirmed by a laboratory test or by a licensed physician and such individual died on or before December 31, 2022.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Samra Brouk [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] |
Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] | Sen. John Mannion [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3988 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.371 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03988 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - signed chap.78