NY S04672 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the priority of persons with responsibility to determine the disposition of human remains.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the priority of persons with responsibility to determine the disposition of human remains.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-08Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-07Senate1ST REPORT CAL.623
2019-03-20SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback