NY S04672 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certified public accountants.
Title
Relates to certified public accountants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2016-05-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.800 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2015-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1620 |
2015-06-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4672A |
2015-06-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2015-04-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05964 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to higher education