NY S04672 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-30 - PRINT NUMBER 4672A
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-30 - PRINT NUMBER 4672A
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a revised residential property condition disclosure statement.
Title
Establishes a revised residential property condition disclosure statement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | PRINT NUMBER 4672A | |
2010-03-30 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | |
2009-04-27 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A1364-A (Same As) 2010-04-07 - print number 1364b