NY S04650 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for unlicensed personnel to administer certain seizure rescue medication in schools, on school grounds and at school events; provides that such medicine may be left with a school health official to be used as needed.
Title
Allows for unlicensed personnel to administer certain seizure rescue medication in schools, on school grounds and at school events; provides that such medicine may be left with a school health official to be used as needed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Assembly | referred to education |
2022-03-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-02-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.507 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | referred to education |
2021-05-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.997 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08049 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to education