NY S04650 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.493
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.493
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reporting on the status and outcomes of initiatives created in response to the heroin and opioid epidemic.
Title
Relates to reporting on the status and outcomes of initiatives created in response to the heroin and opioid epidemic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Senate | signed chap.493 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1013 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4650 |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-06 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-02 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.220 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-23 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-14 | Senate | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2019-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1068 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1013 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A01068 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - signed chap.493