NY S04644 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-16 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-16 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for standards for fire hydrant systems; provides for periodic tests of such systems; requires records of such tests be maintained for a period of ten years.
Title
Provides for standards for fire hydrant systems; provides for periodic tests of such systems; requires records of such tests be maintained for a period of ten years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2024-04-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-04-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-02-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.494 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-03-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.390 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |