NY S04644 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of health to develop state food guidelines for foods purchased, served, and sold by state agencies, programs, and institutions and on state property.
Title
Directs the department of health to develop state food guidelines for foods purchased, served, and sold by state agencies, programs, and institutions and on state property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-23 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4644C |
2022-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.826 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4644B |
2022-02-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-24 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 4644A |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1126 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
Same As/Similar To
A05682 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - reported referred to ways and means