NY S04640 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.479
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the licensure of perfusionists; allows for the issuance of limited permits for a fee of fifty dollars; provides that such permits are subject to the full disciplinary and regulatory authority of the board of regents and the education department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the licensure of perfusionists; allows for the issuance of limited permits for a fee of fifty dollars; provides that such permits are subject to the full disciplinary and regulatory authority of the board of regents and the education department.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03AssemblySIGNED CHAP.479
2012-09-21SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.468
2012-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a4153c
2012-06-18Assemblyreferred to codes
2012-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-12SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4640C
2012-06-11SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 4640B
2012-05-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-05-30SenateAMENDED 4640A
2012-05-23Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-05-22Senate1ST REPORT CAL.887
2012-05-08SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2012-01-04SenateREFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
2012-01-04Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-01-04Assemblydied in assembly
2011-06-21Assemblyreferred to higher education
2011-06-21SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2011-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2011-06-21SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1468
2011-06-21SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2011-04-14SenateREFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A04153 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - substituted by s4640c

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04640&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04640&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04640
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04640&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04640A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04640&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04640C
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2011/S4640#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04640&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback