NY S04613 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - SIGNED CHAP.574
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - SIGNED CHAP.574
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the limitation on highway expenses in the town of Smithtown.
Title
Relates to the limitation on highway expenses in the town of Smithtown.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.574 |
2021-10-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | home rule request |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.441 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a5665 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-01 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2021-05-26 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1338 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05665 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - substituted by s4613