NY S04611 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-06 - PRINT NUMBER 4611A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-06 - PRINT NUMBER 4611A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that any plan of apportionment relating to the division of a county, except a county wholly contained within a city, into districts for the purpose of apportionment or reapportionment of members of its local legislative body shall be subject to federal and state constitutional requirements; further provides for standards to be followed for such plan.
Title
Provides that any plan of apportionment relating to the division of a county, except a county wholly contained within a city, into districts for the purpose of apportionment or reapportionment of members of its local legislative body shall be subject to federal and state constitutional requirements; further provides for standards to be followed for such plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4611A |
2020-03-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.572 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A00426 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - amended on third reading 426b