NY S04594 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-30 - APPROVAL MEMO.103
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-30 - APPROVAL MEMO.103
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "tenant dignity and safe housing act"; authorizes special proceedings by tenants for judgment directing repairs of conditions and other relief in residential real property constituting a violation of local or state housing standards and codes; creates a process by which a tenant may start such proceedings in the court clerk's office; grants jurisdiction to city, district, justice, and New York city civil courts; provides remedies; makes related provisions.
Title
Enacts the "tenant dignity and safe housing act"; authorizes special proceedings by tenants for judgment directing repairs of conditions and other relief in residential real property constituting a violation of local or state housing standards and codes; creates a process by which a tenant may start such proceedings in the court clerk's office; grants jurisdiction to city, district, justice, and New York city civil courts; provides remedies; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-30 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.103 |
2022-12-30 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.825 |
2022-12-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.25 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a354b |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2022-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1888 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4594B |
2022-05-26 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-02-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4594A |
2021-02-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2021-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A00354 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s4594b