NY S04587 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a New York state legend on all bell jar tickets sold in New York state.
Title
Requires a New York state legend on all bell jar tickets sold in New York state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Senate | tabled |
2019-11-25 | Senate | vetoed memo.152 |
2019-11-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1188 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4587 |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2019-03-14 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-07 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.116 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | reported |
2019-02-27 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-04 | Senate | referred to racing and wagering |
2019-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4623 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1188 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A04623 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - tabled