NY S04586 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 4586A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 4586A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to publishing records of public interest by agencies and the legislature on their websites.
Title
Relates to publishing records of public interest by agencies and the legislature on their websites.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4586A |
2018-01-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-02-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04356 (Same As) 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken
A09738 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - referred to governmental operations
A09738 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - referred to governmental operations