NY S04582 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.494
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.494
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to conforming the definition of palliative care under hospice provisions to be the same as under other public health law provisions.
Title
Relates to conforming the definition of palliative care under hospice provisions to be the same as under other public health law provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Senate | signed chap.494 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.540 |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4582 |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-02-26 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-02-26 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-02-21 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.53 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | reported |
2019-02-04 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-14 | Senate | referred to health |
2019-05-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1078 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.540 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A01078 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - signed chap.494