NY S04580 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to operation of a three-wheeled vehicle.
Title
Relates to operation of a three-wheeled vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Senate | tabled |
2020-11-27 | Senate | vetoed memo.59 |
2020-11-18 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.882 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4580C |
2020-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5390b |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.204 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.265 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | rules report cal.265 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-11 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-31 | Senate | print number 5390a |
2019-05-31 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2019-02-11 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2020-07-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5390B |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.882 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4580C |
2020-07-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4580B |
2019-06-12 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4580A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1076 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05390 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - tabled