NY S04572 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes prosecution where a person receives a presidential reprieve, pardon or other form of clemency when certain conditions are met.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes prosecution where a person receives a presidential reprieve, pardon or other form of clemency when certain conditions are met.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-05-21Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-21Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.62
2019-05-21Assemblysubstituted for a6653
2019-05-08Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-05-08SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-04-10SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-04-09Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-08Senate1ST REPORT CAL.394
2019-03-15SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A06653 (Same As) 2019-05-21 - substituted by s4572

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback