NY S04571 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the department of financial services, in consultation with the commissioner of health, to study and report upon insurance coverage for the treatment of Lyme disease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the department of financial services, in consultation with the commissioner of health, to study and report upon insurance coverage for the treatment of Lyme disease.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.363
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a6146
2019-06-11Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-03SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-30Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-29Senate1ST REPORT CAL.988
2019-03-15SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE

Same As/Similar To

A06146 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - substituted by s4571

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback