NY S04569 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-13 - PRINT NUMBER 4569A
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-13 - PRINT NUMBER 4569A
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to orders for temporary spousal support in conjunction with temporary and final orders of protection in family court and calculation of maintenance cap in family and supreme court; increases the income cap.
Title
Relates to orders for temporary spousal support in conjunction with temporary and final orders of protection in family court and calculation of maintenance cap in family and supreme court; increases the income cap.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4569A |
2018-04-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-02-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A06049 (Same As) 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken