NY S04567 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6037
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6037
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to outreach, status and time limits relating to the tax abatement program for rent-controlled and rent-regulated property occupied by senior citizens or persons with disabilities.
Title
Relates to outreach, status and time limits relating to the tax abatement program for rent-controlled and rent-regulated property occupied by senior citizens or persons with disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6037 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1935 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-05-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2017-02-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A06037 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - signed chap.464