NY S04565 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.178
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.178
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of state route 15A in the county of Monroe as the "Mendon Veterans Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of state route 15A in the county of Monroe as the "Mendon Veterans Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.178 |
2015-08-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.657 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a6787a |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-03 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2015-05-27 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4565A |
2015-05-27 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-27 | Senate | returned to senate |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-05-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.528 |
2015-03-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06787 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4565a