NY S04563 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-15 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-15 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the forest ranger force to establish a training program for volunteer search and rescue personnel to assist the forest rangers in wild, remote and forested areas of the state.
Title
Authorizes the forest ranger force to establish a training program for volunteer search and rescue personnel to assist the forest rangers in wild, remote and forested areas of the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2016-03-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-03-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-02-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-02-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.193 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2015-04-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-04-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-04-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.362 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-03-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03509 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to environmental conservation