NY S04555 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes certain tax abatement forms more readily available to seniors and authorizes certain entities to assist in the completion of such forms.
Title
Makes certain tax abatement forms more readily available to seniors and authorizes certain entities to assist in the completion of such forms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6026 |
2018-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1117 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2017-02-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A06026 (Same As) 2018-12-07 - signed chap.360