NY S04555 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Rescinds the anniversary day school holiday for the boroughs of Brooklyn and Queens.
Title
Rescinds the anniversary day school holiday for the boroughs of Brooklyn and Queens.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.748 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2015-03-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07184 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to education