NY S04555 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-01 - SIGNED CHAP.610
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-01 - SIGNED CHAP.610
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing Otsego county to withdraw from the Montgomery, Otsego, Schoharie county solid waste management authority.
Title
Relates to authorizing Otsego county to withdraw from the Montgomery, Otsego, Schoharie county solid waste management authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.610 |
2011-12-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | home rule request |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.375 |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a7212 |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2011-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-13 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2011-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.769 |
2011-04-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4555A |
2011-04-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2011-04-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07212 (Same As) 2011-06-16 - substituted by s4555a