NY S04547 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a holder of a class DJ or class MJ learner's permit, while operating a vehicle, to display a sign indicating that such vehicle is being driven by a new driver; further authorizes the commissioner to create the form and distribution for such sign upon the issuance of the learner's permit.
Title
Requires a holder of a class DJ or class MJ learner's permit, while operating a vehicle, to display a sign indicating that such vehicle is being driven by a new driver; further authorizes the commissioner to create the form and distribution for such sign upon the issuance of the learner's permit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1473 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-02-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07390 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to transportation