NY S04546 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to life, accident and health insurance; relates to discrimination and rebating; also relates to prohibited inducements and independent sales.
Title
Relates to life, accident and health insurance; relates to discrimination and rebating; also relates to prohibited inducements and independent sales.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2018-03-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.443 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2017-04-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-04-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.433 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A01711 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to insurance