NY S04542 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - referred to cities
Pending: Assembly Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - referred to cities
Pending: Assembly Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the New York city planning commission to hold a public community forum prior to approving the location or continued operation of a supportive housing facility.
Title
Requires the New York city planning commission to hold a public community forum prior to approving the location or continued operation of a supportive housing facility.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeffrey Klein [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] |
Sen. Martin Golden [R] | Sen. Jose Peralta [D] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Assembly | referred to cities |
2016-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1985 |
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4542C |
2016-06-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES |
2016-05-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4542B |
2016-05-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | referred to cities |
2015-05-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-19 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4542A |
2015-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.632 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A02553 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - print number 2553c