NY S04533 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires pet dealers to provide recommendations on the care of small animals.
Title
Requires pet dealers to provide recommendations on the care of small animals.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2015-06-25 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-10 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4533B |
2015-06-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1034 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4533A |
2015-04-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2015-03-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A08058 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5946