NY S04530 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5618A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5618A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reimbursement methodologies for tuition.
Title
Relates to reimbursement methodologies for tuition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5618A |
2018-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2002 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4530A |
2018-06-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2017-02-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05618 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - tabled