NY S04530 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - SIGNED CHAP.342
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - SIGNED CHAP.342
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes guidelines for information subpoenas.
Title
Establishes guidelines for information subpoenas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.342 |
2011-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.573 |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | substituted for a6875b |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-20 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2011-06-17 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4530B |
2011-06-17 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4530A |
2011-06-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-06-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.915 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A06875 (Same As) 2011-06-22 - substituted by s4530b