NY S04529 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to operators of a vehicle overtaking a bicycle from behind outside the city of New York.
Title
Relates to operators of a vehicle overtaking a bicycle from behind outside the city of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2022-05-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.630 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.764 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00547 (Same As) 2022-05-18 - print number 547a