NY S04528 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - PRINT NUMBER 4528A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - PRINT NUMBER 4528A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the creation of a school-based teen dating violence prevention program designed to be incorporated into a school district's existing health curriculum to prevent and reduce the incidence and prevalence of teen dating violence.
Title
Relates to the creation of a school-based teen dating violence prevention program designed to be incorporated into a school district's existing health curriculum to prevent and reduce the incidence and prevalence of teen dating violence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4528A |
2018-06-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2017-04-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO EDUCATION |
2017-02-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A05354 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in education