NY S04523 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to establishing a twenty year retirement plan for members or officers of law enforcement; includes every non-seasonally appointed sworn member or officer of the division of law enforcement in the department of environmental conservation, a forest ranger in the service of the department of environmental conservation, a police officer in the department of environmental conservation, the regional state park police, and university police officers in such twenty year plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to establishing a twenty year retirement plan for members or officers of law enforcement; includes every non-seasonally appointed sworn member or officer of the division of law enforcement in the department of environmental conservation, a forest ranger in the service of the department of environmental conservation, a police officer in the department of environmental conservation, the regional state park police, and university police officers in such twenty year plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10Assemblyreturned to senate
2021-06-10Assemblypassed assembly
2021-06-10Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.764
2021-06-10Assemblysubstituted for a6457
2021-06-10Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2021-06-10SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-10SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-06-10SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1743
2021-06-10SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2021-05-18SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2021-02-05SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A06457 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s4523

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback