NY S04519 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-07 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-07 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the legislature's power over the board of regents.
Title
Relates to the legislature's power over the board of regents.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Croci [R] | Sen. John Bonacic [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Jack Martins [R] |
Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-07 | Assembly | referred to education |
2016-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1238 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4519A |
2016-01-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
2015-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-04-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.450 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08069 (Same As) 2016-01-26 - print number 8069a