NY S04511 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7865A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7865A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires social media networks to provide and maintain mechanisms for reporting hateful conduct on their platform.
Title
Requires social media networks to provide and maintain mechanisms for reporting hateful conduct on their platform.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Samra Brouk [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] |
Sen. John Liu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7865A |
2022-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1318 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |
2021-06-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4511A |
2021-06-02 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |
2021-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |
Same As/Similar To
A07865 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - signed chap.204