NY S04505 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination of students on school property or at a school function based on religious attire, clothing or facial hair.
Title
Prohibits discrimination of students on school property or at a school function based on religious attire, clothing or facial hair.
Sponsors
Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Iwen Chu [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Assembly | referred to education |
2024-03-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-03-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-03-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.673 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-03-31 | Assembly | referred to education |
2023-03-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-03-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.535 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4505A |
2023-03-15 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2023-02-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01994 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to education