NY S04496 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse
Pending: Assembly Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates a recovery living task force to establish best practice guidelines for recovery living residences that illustrate the most appropriate and effective environment for persons recovering from a chemical dependency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates a recovery living task force to establish best practice guidelines for recovery living residences that illustrate the most appropriate and effective environment for persons recovering from a chemical dependency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism And Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-04Assemblyreferred to alcoholism and drug abuse
2020-02-04SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-02-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-01-15SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2020-01-14Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2020-01-13Senate1ST REPORT CAL.66
2020-01-08SenatePRINT NUMBER 4496A
2020-01-08SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE
2020-01-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-01-08Assemblydied in assembly
2019-04-29Assemblyreferred to alcoholism and drug abuse
2019-04-29SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-04-29SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-04-10SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-04-09Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-08Senate1ST REPORT CAL.391
2019-03-13SenateREFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE

Same As/Similar To

A06718 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - print number 6718a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback