NY S04495 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to fire inspections in public and private schools; requires the annual fire safety reports.
Title
Relates to fire inspections in public and private schools; requires the annual fire safety reports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2017-05-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4495A |
2017-05-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2017-02-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02985 (Same As) 2018-03-19 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION