NY S04490 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "New York microgrids act" to establish the microgrids of New York grants program within the New York state energy research and development authority; such program shall award monies to certain areas of the state for the purposes of reducing utility rates, reducing utility demand and encouraging use of renewable energy resources.
Title
Enacts the "New York microgrids act" to establish the microgrids of New York grants program within the New York state energy research and development authority; such program shall award monies to certain areas of the state for the purposes of reducing utility rates, reducing utility demand and encouraging use of renewable energy resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2017-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1788 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-04-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4490A |
2017-04-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-03-28 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-02-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08212 (Same As) 2018-02-02 - enacting clause stricken
A09852 (Same As) 2018-02-14 - referred to energy
A09852 (Same As) 2018-02-14 - referred to energy