NY S04484 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.510
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.510
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authorization of the county of Wyoming to impose a county recording tax on obligations secured by a mortgage on real property from December 1, 2021 to December 1, 2024.
Title
Extends the authorization of the county of Wyoming to impose a county recording tax on obligations secured by a mortgage on real property from December 1, 2021 to December 1, 2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-25 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.510 |
2021-10-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | home rule request |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.662 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a6183 |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-05-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-26 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1196 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06183 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - substituted by s4484