NY S04480 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to school energy efficiency collaboration programs; adds private and religious schools to the included partners.
Title
Relates to school energy efficiency collaboration programs; adds private and religious schools to the included partners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.529 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06820 (Same As) 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken