NY S04479 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes retired firefighters to be employed as fire science instructors by career and technical education centers without reduction of their retirement benefits.
Title
Authorizes retired firefighters to be employed as fire science instructors by career and technical education centers without reduction of their retirement benefits.
Sponsors
Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. John Bonacic [R] | Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] |
Sen. Joseph Robach [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1831 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2017-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1332 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06029 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to governmental employees