NY S04478 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.138
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.138
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of pesticides at children's overnight or summer day camps; provides an exception where emergency application is approved by local or state officials.
Title
Prohibits the use of pesticides at children's overnight or summer day camps; provides an exception where emergency application is approved by local or state officials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 112 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.138 |
2021-12-22 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.783 |
2021-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.94 |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | substituted for a528a |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-04-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-30 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4478A |
2021-02-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.380 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00528 (Same As) 2021-05-20 - substituted by s4478a