NY S04471 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to allowing donate life registration when applying for or renewing a hunting, fishing or trapping license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to allowing donate life registration when applying for or renewing a hunting, fishing or trapping license.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-03SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 4471A
2019-05-20SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-15Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-14Senate1ST REPORT CAL.761
2019-03-12SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A07915 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - REFERRED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback