NY S04463 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the purchase of prescription drugs by pharmacies; the same reimbursement amount shall be provided to all pharmacies.
Title
Relates to the purchase of prescription drugs by pharmacies; the same reimbursement amount shall be provided to all pharmacies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2019-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1425 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4463A |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A03043 (Same As) 2020-01-15 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE