NY S04461 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Eastchester creek intermunicipal economic revitalization agency.
Title
Creates the Eastchester creek intermunicipal economic revitalization agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2014-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-11 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1246 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-04-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4461B |
2014-04-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2013-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-21 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2013-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1642 |
2013-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-04-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4461A |
2013-04-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2013-04-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06369 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - reported referred to ways and means