NY S04460 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - PRINT NUMBER 4460A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - PRINT NUMBER 4460A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to eligibility to assume office for certain elected officials owing past-due tax liabilities.
Title
Relates to eligibility to assume office for certain elected officials owing past-due tax liabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4460A |
2018-02-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-02-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08912 (Same As) 2018-03-01 - print number 8912a