NY S04455 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3320A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to stipulations in summary proceedings to recover possession of real property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to stipulations in summary proceedings to recover possession of real property.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A3320A
2021-05-24SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-05-20Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-05-20SenateAMENDED 4455A
2021-05-18Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1082
2021-02-04SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A03320 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback